Ellison, Jason John (CPSO#: 86520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Canadian Forces H Svc C
Detachment North Bay
General Delivery Stn Main
Hornell Heights ON  P0H 1P0
Phone: (705) 494-2011 Ext. 2101
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON JOHN ELLISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2014