Ellman, Jon Peter (CPSO#: 23566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3600 McTavish Street
Montreal QC  H3A 1Y2
Phone: (514) 398-6019
Fax: (514) 398-2559

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JON PETER ELLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Nov 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1982