Ells, Anna Lieb (CPSO#: 58369)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 26 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Sep 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Nov 2001