Elltoft, John David (CPSO#: 20968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
209 Church Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 3E8
Phone: (905) 682-5657
Fax: 289 296 6605
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3456 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2J 2K4
Canada
Phone: (289) 296-6606
Fax: (289) 296-6605
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John David Elltoft Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Elltoft ( CPSO# 20968 )

Business Address:
209 Church Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 3E8
Phone Number: (905) 682-5657

Business Address:
3456 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2J 2K4
Phone Number: (289) 296-6606

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 May 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Feb 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  John David Elltoft may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.