Elman, Debra Ruth (CPSO#: 69481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite A-101
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4934
Fax: (416) 480-6038
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Debra Elman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Elman ( CPSO# 69481 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Suite A-101
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4934

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRA RUTH ELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995