Elmaraghy, Amr Waguih (CPSO#: 68094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 504
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 530-0400
Fax: (416) 530-0692
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMR WAGUIH ELMARAGHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELMARAGHY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000