Elmaraghy, Mohamed Waguih (CPSO#: 66461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
135 Erb Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1M3
Phone: (519) 585-0859
Fax: (519) 585-7847
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. W. Elmaraghy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Elmaraghy ( CPSO# 66461 )

Business Address:
100 - 135 Erb Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1M3
Phone Number: (519) 585-0859

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - District of Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED WAGUIH ELMARAGHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELMARAGHY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1998