Elmayergi, Nader Hassan (CPSO#: 84140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 264-0022
Fax: (905) 264-0085
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADER HASSAN ELMAYERGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELMAYERGI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2006 to 07 May 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2015