Eloskouf, Carol Mamdouh Mikhail Youssef (CPSO#: 83899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
132 The Queensway South
Keswick ON  L4P 1Z7
Phone: (905) 989-2388
Fax: (905) 989-0898
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

612 Elgin Mills Rd West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4M2
Canada
Phone: (905) 237-0287
Fax: (905) 237-0274
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

70 Forest Manor Road Unit 6
Toronto ON  M2J 0A9
Canada
Phone: 416-901-2224
Fax: 416-901-3344
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL MAMDOUH MIKHAIL YOUSSEF ELOSKOUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELOSKOUF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2006 to 02 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2007