Elrefai, Thaer Hussein (CPSO#: 87827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Russian

Education:Rostovskij Medicinskij Institut, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primary Health care corporation
West Bay Health center
Al Asdaf St
Doha 0000
Qatar
Phone: 974 4027 3888
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elrefai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Qatar
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THAER HUSSEIN ELREFAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELREFAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010