Elsawiniya, Abdelbaset Ahmed (CPSO#: 74335)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2005