Elsayed, Sameer (CPSO#: 68843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8726
Fax: (519) 685-8109
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sameer Elsayed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elsayed ( CPSO# 68843 )

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6207

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
183 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEER ELSAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELSAYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000