Eltawil, Karim Mohamed (CPSO#: 97650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alexandria, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
La Verendrye Hospital
Riverside Healthcare
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone: (807) 274-3261
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nugent ( CPSO# 66632 )
Dr. S. Elkheir ( CPSO# 98789 )
Dr. J. Nelson ( CPSO# 55513 )
Dr. L. Jenks ( CPSO# 55667 )
Dr. B. Anderson ( CPSO# 69844 )
Dr. M. Halvorsen ( CPSO# 100103)
Dr. K. Eltawil ( CPSO# 97650 )
Dr. V. Patel ( CPSO# 108275)
Dr. M. Ruppenstein ( CPSO# 98445 )
Dr. M. Kowal ( CPSO# 100791)

Business Address:
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone Number: (807) 274-3287

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3261

Business Address:
1460 Idylwild Drive
RMB 2004 RR#2
Fort Frances ON  P9A 3M3

Business Address:
310 Nelson Street
Fort Frances ON  P9A 1B1
Phone Number: (807) 274-7708

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARIM MOHAMED ELTAWIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTAWIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017