Eltriki, Abdulslam Mostafa (CPSO#: 85822)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2006 to 18 Jan 2007
PEAP - Resident - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 21 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Apr 2009 to 21 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2013 to 31 May 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Sep 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2015