Elyas, Tereza (CPSO#: 93941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primacy Dufferin Family Care Centre
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 3N4
Phone: (416)739-1562
Fax: (416)739-6671
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St.
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6265 Ext. 1
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Elyas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Elyas ( CPSO# 93941 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6265

Business Address:
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
North York ON  M3J 3N4
Phone Number: (416) 739-1562

Business Address:
1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 285-7575

Business Address:
550 Queens Quay West
Toronto ON  M5V 3M8
Phone Number: (647) 347-0576

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEREZA ELYAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELYAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2012