Elyousfi, Abdulhamid A (CPSO#: 92400)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 14 Jan 2010 to 24 Feb 2010
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2014