Elzayat, Ehab Abdalla (CPSO#: 97630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Azhar University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: 6138660004 Ext. 1234
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EHAB ABDALLA ELZAYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELZAYAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Urology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017