Emami, Shahram Sean (CPSO#: 74780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renew Medical Clinic
1015 Cawthra Road
Mississauga ON  L5G 4K3
Phone: (905) 271-1134
Fax: (905) 271-1136
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.S. Emami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Emami ( CPSO# 74780 )

Business Address:
2898 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 1J2
Phone Number: (416) 255-5542

Business Address:
955 Westney Road South
Suite 7A
Ajax ON  L1S 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 581-0663

Business Address:
4 Talbot Street East
Leamington ON  N8H 1L2
Phone Number: (519) 322-4926

Business Address:
1015 Cawthra Road
Mississauga ON  L5G 4K3
Phone Number: (905) 271-1134

Business Address:
141 Hespeler Road
Suite 1
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G9
Phone Number: (226) 499-0600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHRAM SEAN EMAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMAMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 17 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2001 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2003