Emara, Barry Yehia (CPSO#: 68758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Walkerville Medical Centre
2224 Walker Road
Suite 200
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 258-0162
Fax: (519) 252-7223
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry Y. Emara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Emara ( CPSO# 68758 )

Business Address:
South Walkerville Medical Centre
200 - 2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 258-0162

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY YEHIA EMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMARA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000