Embree, Harold Kenneth (CPSO#: 20773)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014