Emmanuel, Stephanie Jesica (CPSO#: 109841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2543
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE JESICA EMMANUEL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. EMMANUEL is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. EMMANUEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EMMANUEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. EMMANUEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. EMMANUEL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. EMMANUEL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018