Emmerton-Coughlin, Heather Margaret Anne (CPSO#: 91447)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 25 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2014 to 25 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2017