Emmett, John Albert Jephson (CPSO#: 20800)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 14 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Oct 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian

Education:University of Queensland, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1967
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 14 Oct 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Oct 2002
Summary:

 On October 7, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Emmett(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient.  The Committee ordered the 
 following penalty:

1.	The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Emmett to attend before this panel to 
 be 	reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2.		The Discipline 
 Committee directs the Registrar to revoke Dr. Emmett(s certificate of 		registration effective 
 October 14, 2002.

3.	The Discipline Committee Orders Dr. Emmett to reimburse the College for 
 funding up to 	the amount of $10,000 provided for the complainant under the program required under 
 s. 	85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code and directs Dr. Emmett to post security in 	the 
 amount of $10,000 acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario to 	guarantee 
 the payment of any amounts Dr. Emmett may be required to reimburse under 	this order.  

In 
 addition, the Discipline Committee requires that Dr. Emmett pay part of the College(s costs to the 
 College, fixed in the amount of $ 2,500.00 by October 28, 2002.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 07, 2002