Emon, Steven Joseph (CPSO#: 64071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 112
115 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5G1
Phone: (705) 727-1500
Fax: (705) 727-1562
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Emon ( CPSO# 64071 )

Business Address:
Suite 112
115 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5G1
Phone Number: (705) 727-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 27 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN JOSEPH EMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992