Emond, Yannick (CPSO#: 101637)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2017