Emrich, Hans Walter (CPSO#: 29473)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Walter Emrich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 71 Clergy Street East Kingston, ON K7L 3J3 Telephone: 613-542-7858
Date Received: 15 Dec 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015