Emtage, Jerry Bruce (CPSO#: 50505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Barbados

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JERRY BRUCE EMTAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMTAGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2001