Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Eng, Kenneth (CPSO#: 70091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room M1 202B
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4688
Fax: (416) 480-4481
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Eng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Eng ( CPSO# 70091 )

Business Address:
Room M1-202B
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4481

Business Address:
Suite 600
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001