Engbers, Peter Bernhard (CPSO#: 53938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4205
Fax: (519) 421-4237
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER BERNHARD ENGBERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGBERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1989