Engel, Cecil Jay (CPSO#: 54252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ont
Department of Surgical Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 6651
Fax: (613) 546-8221
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Jay Engel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Engel ( CPSO# 54252 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
Department of Surgical Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CECIL JAY ENGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1985