Engelberg, David (CPSO#: 81556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI The Doctor's Office
Royal Bank Plaza
200 Bay Street, Unit LR8
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Phone: (416) 368-6787
Fax: (416) 368-7632
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI The Doctor's Office
First Canadian Place
100 King St W
Lower Concourse
Toronto ON  M5X 2A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-1200
Fax: (416) 867-1201
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Q Esthetics Laser Clinic
24 Bellair Street
3rd. Floor
Toronto ON  M5R 2C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 599-1788
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Altima Yonge Eglinton Dental Centre
2300 Yonge Street, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Canada
Phone: (416) 322-9944
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ENGELBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGELBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2006