Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Engell, Anne Katherine (CPSO#: 56221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
15 Elizabeth Street East
Creemore ON  L0M 1G0
Phone: (705) 466-3077
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

186 Erie Street
Suite 207
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Canada
Phone: (705) 446-0011
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Engell and Houston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Houston ( CPSO# 55296 )
Dr. A. Engell ( CPSO# 56221 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
15 Elizabeth Street East
Creemore ON  L0M 1G0
Phone Number: (705) 466-3077

Business Address:
207 - 186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone Number: (705) 446-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE KATHERINE ENGELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1985