Engineer, Ariz Aspi (CPSO#: 58415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 322-9933
Fax: (416) 322-7097
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIZ ASPI ENGINEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGINEER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 May 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1989
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Jun 2002