England, Ronald Melvin (CPSO#: 32239)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 1991