Engle, John Raymond (CPSO#: 94246)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ohio State University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kincardine Community Medical Clinic, 44 Queen Street, Kincardine, ON, N2Z 3C1
Date Received: 02 Jun 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Aug 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jan 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2016