Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Englert, Peter Sebastian (CPSO#: 30207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 1269
69 Main Street East
Grand Bend ON  N0M 1T0
Phone: (519) 238-2362
Fax: (519) 238-6478
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PO Box 159
122 King Street
Hensall ON  N0M 1X0
Canada
Phone: (519) 262-3140
Fax: (519) 262-2448
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Englert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Englert ( CPSO# 30207 )

Business Address:
69 Main Street East
Grand Bend ON  N0M 1T0
Phone Number: (519) 238-2362

Business Address:
122 King Street
Hensall ON  N0M 1X0
Phone Number: (519) 262-3140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER SEBASTIAN ENGLERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGLERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1978