English, John Charles (CPSO#: 54336)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Nov 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Nov 1995