English, Robert Lorne (CPSO#: 27099)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4 (416) 718-3461
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Feb 2010