Enker, Irwin Paul (CPSO#: 32097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1991 Marcus Avenue
Second Floor
Lake Success NY  11042
United States
Phone: (516) 829-0876
Fax: (516) 941-4626

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - New York
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRWIN PAUL ENKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1987 to 31 Mar 1987
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2003