Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ennett, Joseph Russell (CPSO#: 61096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
113 Fourth Street
Rainy River ON  P0W 1L0
Phone: (807) 852-3222
Fax: (888) 257-3990
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.R. Ennett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ennett ( CPSO# 61096 )

Business Address:
113 Fourth Street
Rainy River ON  P0W 1L0
Phone Number: (807) 852-3222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Emo
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH RUSSELL ENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENNETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990