Enright, Mark Leonard (CPSO#: 58292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 445-4334
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Collingwood General Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
Phone: (705) 445-2550
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Enright Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Enright ( CPSO# 58292 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 445-4334

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK LEONARD ENRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1988