Ensing, Dianne Mary (CPSO#: 50507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11
450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone: (519) 725-4070
Fax: (519) 725-4071
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Norman Bodkin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ensing ( CPSO# 50507 )
Dr. R. Bodkin ( CPSO# 33232 )

Business Address:
205 - 535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone Number: (519) 578-0941

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANNE MARY ENSING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENSING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1984