Ensminger, Shauna Lynne (CPSO#: 63961)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Oct 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 1997