Eom, Minjeong (CPSO#: 80804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 16
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Fax: (613) 228-2856
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Eom ( CPSO# 80804 )

Business Address:
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2
Phone Number: (613) 228-2882

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINJEONG EOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EOM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006