Epelman, Slava (CPSO#: 105228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street TmDT Building,
3rd floor, Rm 903
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5309
Fax: (416) 340-4127
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Slava Epelman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Epelman ( CPSO# 105228)

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
TMDT Building 3-903
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 09 Jun 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Dec 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Slava Epelman may practice medicine independently in internal medicine and
            cardiology.