Ephtimios, Issa Ephtime Issa (CPSO#: 67246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISSA EPHTIME ISSA EPHTIMIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EPHTIMIOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1995