Eplett, Catherine Jane (CPSO#: 54070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
20 Wynford Drive
Don Mills ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 441-3580
Fax: (416) 441-3280
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE JANE EPLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EPLETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1987