Epstein, Norman Lyle (CPSO#: 55406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4141
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3869 Jane Street
Downsview ON  M3N 2K1
Canada
Phone: 416-636-7077
Fax: 416-635-0562
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Norman Lyle Epstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Epstein ( CPSO# 55406 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
3869 Jane Street
Downsview ON  M3N 2K1
Phone Number: (416) 636-7077

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN LYLE EPSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EPSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1986