Eralp, Michael Suha (CPSO#: 21772)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Eralp, Muammer Suha (used until: 26 Oct 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Istanbul University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009