Eras, Danielle Marie (CPSO#: 103503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 345-1240
Fax: (807) 345-1122
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danielle Eras Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Eras ( CPSO# 103503)

Business Address:
Suite 301
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Phone Number: (807) 346-1240

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE MARIE ERAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 28 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2017